This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 05/03/2019 at 12:45:43 (UTC).

FOX RUN PHASE I MAINTENANCE AS VS ALBERT, KYLE

Case Summary

On 04/09/2019 FOX RUN PHASE I MAINTENANCE AS filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALBERT, KYLE. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FOX RUN PHASE I MAINTENANCE AS

FOX RUN (PHASE I) MAINTENANCE

Defendant

ALBERT, KYLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENSOR, JACOB

 

Court Documents

20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED: SERVED ON KYLE ALBERT ON 4/17/19 @ 9:46AM:

04/25/2019:20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED: SERVED ON KYLE ALBERT ON 4/17/19 @ 9:46AM:

ORIGINAL LIS PENDENS RECORDED:

04/12/2019:ORIGINAL LIS PENDENS RECORDED:

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO KYLE ALBERT AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

04/09/2019:TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO KYLE ALBERT AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

04/09/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (SENT TO RECORDING WITH $9 RECEIPT)

04/09/2019:NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (SENT TO RECORDING WITH $9 RECEIPT)

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

04/09/2019:NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

COMPLAINT

04/09/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/09/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED: SERVED ON KYLE ALBERT ON 4/17/19 @ 9:46AM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL LIS PENDENS RECORDED:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO KYLE ALBERT AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (SENT TO RECORDING WITH $9 RECEIPT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Case 432019CC000640CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less