This case was last updated from Martin County Florida Courts on 01/19/2023 at 15:00:26 (UTC).

ESSEN, DONOVAN vs. CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 ESSEN, DONOVAN filed an Other lawsuit against CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Martin County Florida Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESSEN, DONOVAN

Defendants

CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES INC

CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATTI, THOMAS J

Defendant Attorney

WONDER, CHANTEL C

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

2/28/2022: COMPLAINT

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

2/28/2022: PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS TO DEFENDANT

2/28/2022: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS TO DEFENDANT

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #220006004

2/28/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #220006004

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES INC D/B/A CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES AND RETURNED TO ATTORNET VIA E-SERVICE

2/28/2022: TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES INC D/B/A CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES AND RETURNED TO ATTORNET VIA E-SERVICE

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL

3/23/2022: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL

NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL- BOOK / PAGE 3303/2024

3/31/2022: NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL- BOOK / PAGE 3303/2024

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL- BOOK / PAGE 3303/2024

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 220006004; Applied Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CREDIT CONTROL SERVICES INC D/B/A CREDIT COLLECTION SERVICES AND RETURNED TO ATTORNET VIA E-SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #220006004

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF DISCOVERY REQUESTS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketEPORTAL SUMMONS $10.00 ASSESSED $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCLAIMS $2500.01-$15000 ASSESSED $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 22000395CCAXMX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less