This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 03/19/2019 at 01:46:12 (UTC).

ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPA VS SCALA, CHRISTOPHER

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SCALA, CHRISTOPHER. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNIFER WATERS and WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNIFER WATERS

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT COMPA

Defendant

SCALA, CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE LUIS

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED CHRISTOPHER SCALA:

02/13/2019:PRETRIAL SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED CHRISTOPHER SCALA:

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER SCALA AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 2.19.19 AT 9 AM

01/22/2019:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER SCALA AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 2.19.19 AT 9 AM

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

01/18/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

01/18/2019:PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

COMPLAINT

01/18/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/18/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • Updated Event PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE on 2/19/2019 0900 AM Judge JENNIFER WATERS results DISPOSED on 2/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRETRIAL SUMMONS RETURNED NON SERVED CHRISTOPHER SCALA:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Event PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 2/19/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JENNIFER WATERS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER SCALA AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 2.19.19 AT 9 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Case 432019SC000096SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Event Date: 02/19/2019 09:00; Judge: WATERS, JENNIFER; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX A2-1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, AS MANAGER FOR HERON POINTE APTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.