This case was last updated from Martin County Florida Courts on 01/19/2023 at 12:16:09 (UTC).

DOWLING, KENNETH E vs. DOWLING, JAMES H

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 DOWLING, KENNETH E filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against DOWLING, JAMES H. This case was filed in Martin County Florida Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J

 

Party Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified

DOWLING, JAMES H

Not Classified By Court

DOWLING, KENNETH E

BESSEMER TRUST COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

WOOD, STEVEN J

Other Attorneys

WOOD, MARGARET E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketVERIFIED INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSATISFACTION & RELEASE OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketSATISFACTION & RELEASE OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY $77.74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FEDERAL ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST - EMAILED TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketOATH OF CORPORATE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE - ORIGINAL TO BE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketFORMAL ADMINISTRATION ASSESSED $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/24/2022 CASE NUMBER 22000226CPAXMX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less