This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 03/21/2019 at 14:47:06 (UTC).

DOE, JANE Et Al VS MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 DOE, JANE filed an Other lawsuit against MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBY, WILLIAM L and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBY, WILLIAM L

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOE, JOHN

DOE, JANE

Defendants

MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

STATE ATTORNEYS OFFICE 19TH CI

CBS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAGNER, JORDAN REID

Defendant Attorney

JACOBS, ARTHUR IVAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING :

03/18/2019:NOTICE OF FILING :

LETTER FROM BARBARA KIBBEY WAGNER, ESQ DATED 03.18.2019:

03/18/2019:LETTER FROM BARBARA KIBBEY WAGNER, ESQ DATED 03.18.2019:

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REHEARING:

03/15/2019:PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REHEARING:

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE; SIGNED 03.14.2019:

03/14/2019:ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE; SIGNED 03.14.2019:

ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; SIGNED 03.14.2019:

03/14/2019:ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; SIGNED 03.14.2019:

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY ARTHUR A WYLER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT:

03/13/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY ARTHUR A WYLER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT:

UNOPPOSED MOTION TO INTERVENE TO OPPOSE THE ACTION:

03/12/2019:UNOPPOSED MOTION TO INTERVENE TO OPPOSE THE ACTION:

MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT:

03/11/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT:

ANSWER AND AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSES:

03/07/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRAMTIVE DEFENSES:

MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT:

03/07/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT:

SUMMONS-SERVED-BRUCE COLTON ESQ ., STATE ATTORNEY-2-26-2019 8:48AM (SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED):

03/04/2019:SUMMONS-SERVED-BRUCE COLTON ESQ ., STATE ATTORNEY-2-26-2019 8:48AM (SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED):

SUMMONS-SERVED-2-28-2019 9:59AM (SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED):

03/04/2019:SUMMONS-SERVED-2-28-2019 9:59AM (SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED):

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF' OFFICE & STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF' OFFICE & STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT:

02/25/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE:

02/25/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE:

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT:

02/25/2019:COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT:

CIVIL COVER SHEET :

02/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET :

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER FROM BARBARA KIBBEY WAGNER, ESQ DATED 03.18.2019:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE REOPENED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Reopened for OTHER on 3/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REHEARING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING MOTION TO INTERVENE; SIGNED 03.14.2019:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS; SIGNED 03.14.2019:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY ARTHUR A WYLER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNOPPOSED MOTION TO INTERVENE TO OPPOSE THE ACTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-SERVED-BRUCE COLTON ESQ ., STATE ATTORNEY-2-26-2019 8:48AM (SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS-SERVED-2-28-2019 9:59AM (SUMMONS NOT ATTACHED):

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF' OFFICE & STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- STATE ATTORNEY'S OFFICE 19TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF OFFICE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Case 432019CA000233CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • Reopen Date: 03/15/2019; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BF STURTEVANT is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF STATE ATTORNEY OF DA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS, ARTHUR IVAN