This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 04/22/2019 at 17:46:25 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS MUNNELLY, MARY BETH

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MUNNELLY, MARY BETH. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNIFER WATERS and WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNIFER WATERS

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

MUNNELLY, MARY BETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.

BROWN, NATAIJA JOYCE

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON MARY BETH MUNNELLY 4.4.19 BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON PATRICK (LAST NAME NOT DISCLOSED)

04/12/2019:PRETRIAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON MARY BETH MUNNELLY 4.4.19 BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON PATRICK (LAST NAME NOT DISCLOSED)

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARY BETH MUNNELLY AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 5.14.19 AT 9AM

04/01/2019:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARY BETH MUNNELLY AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 5.14.19 AT 9AM

PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

03/29/2019:PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

STATEMENT OF CLAIM:

03/29/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM:

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/29/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRETRIAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON MARY BETH MUNNELLY 4.4.19 BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON PATRICK (LAST NAME NOT DISCLOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Event PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 5/14/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JENNIFER WATERS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO MARY BETH MUNNELLY AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 5.14.19 AT 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Case 432019SC000591SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Event Date: 05/14/2019 09:00; Judge: WATERS, JENNIFER; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX A2-1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brown, Nataija Joyce

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.