This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 07/09/2019 at 14:45:56 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS HERT, SHANNON

Case Summary

On 06/15/2019 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERT, SHANNON. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBY, WILLIAM L and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBY, WILLIAM L

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

HERT, SHANNON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLET, CHRISTINA N.

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- SHANNON HERT:

06/15/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- SHANNON HERT:

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - SHANNON HERT- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

06/17/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - SHANNON HERT- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

CIVIL COVER SHEET :

06/15/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET :

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SERVED UPON SHANNON HERT ON 06.22.2019 AT 12:26 PM; SUMMONS ATTACHED

06/26/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SERVED UPON SHANNON HERT ON 06.22.2019 AT 12:26 PM; SUMMONS ATTACHED

COMPLAINT :

06/15/2019:COMPLAINT :

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS SERVED UPON SHANNON HERT ON 06.22.2019 AT 12:26 PM; SUMMONS ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - SHANNON HERT- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- SHANNON HERT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2019
  • Case 432019CA000767CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.