This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 06/16/2019 at 14:45:31 (UTC).

COMPLETE ELECTRICAL SYSTEMS IN VS BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 COMPLETE ELECTRICAL SYSTEMS IN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBY, WILLIAM L and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBY, WILLIAM L

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMPLETE ELECTRICAL SYSTEMS IN

Defendant

BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ITTLEMAN, GEOFFREY DAVID

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, ON 5.28.19 (SUMMONS ATTACHED):

06/11/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, ON 5.28.19 (SUMMONS ATTACHED):

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

05/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC

05/23/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC

COMPLAINT

05/23/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED ON BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC, ON 5.28.19 (SUMMONS ATTACHED):

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES LLC- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Case 432019CA000673CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYVIEW CONSTRUCTION SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ittleman, Geoffrey D.