This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 03/07/2019 at 14:56:34 (UTC).

CF FLORIDA OWNER LLC VS DOHNA, SHANNON Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 CF FLORIDA OWNER LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DOHNA, SHANNON. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTS, KATHLEEN H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTS, KATHLEEN H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CF FLORIDA OWNER LLC

Defendants

DOHNA, SHANNON

GRIFFITH, MILAN

Not Classified By Court

DBA ASTORWOOD APARTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWISTAK, MICHAEL PATRICK

 

Court Documents

LETTER FROM ATTORNEY JAY L SWISTAK DATED 2/25/19 REQUESTING THE WRIT OF POSSESSION BE CANCELLED:

02/27/2019:LETTER FROM ATTORNEY JAY L SWISTAK DATED 2/25/19 REQUESTING THE WRIT OF POSSESSION BE CANCELLED:

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO MCSO WITH A $90.00 CHECK/ COPY IN FILE:

02/12/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO MCSO WITH A $90.00 CHECK/ COPY IN FILE:

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION/ SIGNED 1/29/19:

01/29/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION/ SIGNED 1/29/19:

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF TENANT EVICTION:

01/28/2019:PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF TENANT EVICTION:

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

01/28/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

01/28/2019:NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON SHANNON DOHNA ON 1/21/19 @ 12:35PM:l

01/28/2019:FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON SHANNON DOHNA ON 1/21/19 @ 12:35PM:l

FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON MILAN GRIFFITH ON 1/21/19 @ 12:45PM:

01/28/2019:FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON MILAN GRIFFITH ON 1/21/19 @ 12:45PM:

ANSWER :

01/27/2019:ANSWER :

ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT:

01/25/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT:

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK - MAILER:

01/24/2019:CERTIFICATE OF CLERK - MAILER:

FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO MILAN GRIFFITH AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

01/16/2019:FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO MILAN GRIFFITH AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHANNON DOHNA AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

01/16/2019:FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHANNON DOHNA AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

01/16/2019:PROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

PROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

01/16/2019:PROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

COMPLAINT

01/16/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/16/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • CLERK'S NOTES: WRIT OF POSSESSION AND CHECK #1001 IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00 RETURNED TO ATTORNEY SWISTAK LEVINE AS REQUESTED:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER FROM ATTORNEY JAY L SWISTAK DATED 2/25/19 REQUESTING THE WRIT OF POSSESSION BE CANCELLED:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED AND HANDED TO MCSO WITH A $90.00 CHECK/ COPY IN FILE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Case Status set to CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION/ SIGNED 1/29/19:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF TENANT EVICTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON SHANNON DOHNA ON 1/21/19 @ 12:35PM:l

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FIVE DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON MILAN GRIFFITH ON 1/21/19 @ 12:45PM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY DEFENDANT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF CLERK - MAILER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO MILAN GRIFFITH AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FIVE DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO SHANNON DOHNA AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 5 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Case 432019CC000072CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less