This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 04/04/2019 at 12:46:55 (UTC).

BRITE FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC VS BUCCIERI, MICHELLE Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 BRITE FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against BUCCIERI, MICHELLE. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRITE FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Defendants

BUCCIERI, PAUL

BUCCIERI, MICHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KILBURN, PATRICK JAMES

 

Court Documents

20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON MICHELLE BUCCIERI 3.18.19

03/25/2019:20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON MICHELLE BUCCIERI 3.18.19

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHELLE BUCCIERI AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

03/14/2019:TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHELLE BUCCIERI AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAUL BUCCIERI AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

03/14/2019:TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAUL BUCCIERI AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

03/13/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

03/13/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

COMPLAINT

03/13/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/13/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON MICHELLE BUCCIERI 3.18.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO MICHELLE BUCCIERI AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO PAUL BUCCIERI AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Case 432019CC000457CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less