This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 07/27/2019 at 15:16:02 (UTC).

BRENT, MARGUERITE Et Al VS DIONISIO, CATHY Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 BRENT, MARGUERITE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DIONISIO, CATHY. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRENT, MARGUERITE

BRENT, TOMMIE

Defendants

TREASURE COAST TOPDOC PLLC

MARTIN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER

DIONISIO, CATHY

LEHACHI, YOUNES MD

MALTMAN, MICHAEL MD

TREASURE COAST HOSPITALIST PL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COOK, JACK TOBIAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • CLERK'S NOTES- LEVI- ATTORNEY NEEDS TO SUBMIT AN ADDITIONAL $2.50 FOR 1 ADDITIONAL DEFENDANT- SUMMONES ARE TO BE PROCESSED UPTON RECEIPT OF THE $2.50:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • PETITION PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 766.104(2)- ORIGINALLY FILED ON 4/11/18:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET- ORIGINALLY FILED ON 4/11/18:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- TREASURE COAST TOPDOC PLLC:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- MICHAEL MALTMAN MD:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- TREASURE COAST HOSPITALIST PL:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- CATHY DIONISIO ARNP,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- YOUNES LEHACHI MD:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- MARTIN MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER INC DBA MARTIN MEDICAL CENTER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • MOTION TO SET MANDATORY MEDIATIOON WITHIN 120 DAYS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • COMPLAINT :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Case 432019CA000932CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 7/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.