This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 03/15/2019 at 14:47:25 (UTC).

BONAN-RUBIN, JENNY Et Al VS GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 BONAN-RUBIN, JENNY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUBIN, ROBERT

BONAN-RUBIN, JENNY

Defendants

WILLIAMS, GEORGE

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE

ROADSTAR PAVING LLC

HODGSON, JOHNATHON

WILLIAMS, SHIRLEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WARD, DONALD JACK

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 SHIRLEY WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY:

03/08/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 SHIRLEY WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 ROADSTAR PAVING LLC:

03/08/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 ROADSTAR PAVING LLC:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 JOHNATHON HODGSON, INDIVIDUALLY:

03/08/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 JOHNATHON HODGSON, INDIVIDUALLY:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 GEORGE WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY:

03/08/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 GEORGE WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY:

03/08/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY:

AMENDED COMPLAINT

03/08/2019:AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GEORGE WILLIAMS, ROADSTAR PAVING LLC, JOHNATHON HODGSON, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

02/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GEORGE WILLIAMS, ROADSTAR PAVING LLC, JOHNATHON HODGSON, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

02/20/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- JOHNATHON HODGSON

02/20/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- JOHNATHON HODGSON

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- GEORGE WILLIAMS

02/20/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- GEORGE WILLIAMS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JOHNATHON HODGSON:

02/20/2019:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JOHNATHON HODGSON:

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT JOHNATHON HODGSON:

02/20/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT JOHNATHON HODGSON:

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

02/20/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ROADSTAR PAVING LLC

02/20/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ROADSTAR PAVING LLC

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO JOHNATHON HODGSON:

02/20/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO JOHNATHON HODGSON:

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT GEORGE WILLIAMS:

02/20/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT GEORGE WILLIAMS:

COMPLAINT

02/20/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/20/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: SHIRLEY WILLIAMS, ROADSTAR PAVING LLC, JOHNATHON HODGSON, GEORGE WILLIAMS & GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 SHIRLEY WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 ROADSTAR PAVING LLC:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 JOHNATHON HODGSON, INDIVIDUALLY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 GEORGE WILLIAMS, INDIVIDUALLY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: GEORGE WILLIAMS, ROADSTAR PAVING LLC, JOHNATHON HODGSON, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY; RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO - GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- JOHNATHON HODGSON

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- GEORGE WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT JOHNATHON HODGSON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT JOHNATHON HODGSON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ROADSTAR PAVING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO JOHNATHON HODGSON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT GEORGE WILLIAMS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Case 432019CA000219CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald J Ward Iii