This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 03/09/2019 at 19:37:08 (UTC).

BARTON-SCHMITT, MELISSA NICOLE VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2019 BARTON-SCHMITT, MELISSA NICOLE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBY, WILLIAM L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBY, WILLIAM L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARTON-SCHMITT, MELISSA NICOLE

Defendants

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPAN

MARTINEZ, HARRIET ATHENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASTOLA, JEFF

Defendant Attorney

POPRAWSKI, SEBASTIAN K.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF:

02/22/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF:

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION: TO PLAINTIFF:

02/22/2019:REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION: TO PLAINTIFF:

DEFENDANT, HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ'S, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

02/22/2019:DEFENDANT, HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ'S, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED SUMMONS ON GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY 2.5.19:

02/12/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED SUMMONS ON GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY 2.5.19:

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED SUBSTITUTE ON HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ 2.2.19:

02/12/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED SUBSTITUTE ON HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ 2.2.19:

NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

01/31/2019:NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY & HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

01/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY & HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY:

01/30/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY:

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ:

01/30/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ:

COMPLAINT :

01/30/2019:COMPLAINT :

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF SERVING NEGLIGENCE INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT, HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION: TO PLAINTIFF:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT, HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ'S, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED SUMMONS ON GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY 2.5.19:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED SUBSTITUTE ON HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ 2.2.19:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE BY CLERK:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO: - GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY & HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ- E-SERVED TO ATTORNEY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10 TO- HARRIET ATHENA MARTINEZ:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Case 432019CA000124CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POPRAWSKI, SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ