This case was last updated from Martin County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/10/2019 at 14:46:40 (UTC).

BARGMON, ANTHONY VS MARTIN COUNTY Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 BARGMON, ANTHONY filed an Other lawsuit against MARTIN COUNTY. This case was filed in Martin County - Nineteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are WATERS, JENNIFER and LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

WATERS, JENNIFER

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARGMON, ANTHONY

Defendants

MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTME

MARTIN COUNTY

SNYDER, SHERIFF, WILLIAM D

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET:

04/16/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET:

COMPLAINT:

04/16/2019:COMPLAINT:

LETTER DATED 4/24/19 TO INMATE ANTHONY BARGMON;

04/24/2019:LETTER DATED 4/24/19 TO INMATE ANTHONY BARGMON;

AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES:

05/02/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES:

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT:

05/02/2019:FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT:

INMATES TRUST ACCOUNT:

05/02/2019:INMATES TRUST ACCOUNT:

CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE-57.081:

05/02/2019:CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE-57.081:

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE-57.081:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INMATES TRUST ACCOUNT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER DATED 4/24/19 TO INMATE ANTHONY BARGMON;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Case 432019CA000482CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 4/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Judge: LEVIN , STEVEN J assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Martin County is a litigant

Latest cases where MARTIN COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE is a litigant