This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 06/13/2019 at 12:46:29 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS VASANJEE, ANASTASIA P

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed an Other lawsuit against VASANJEE, ANASTASIA P. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

VASANJEE, ANASTASIA P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA, JORGE LUIS

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/04/2019:DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON ANASTASIA P VASANJEE ON 5/23/19 @ 7:12PM:

05/28/2019:20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON ANASTASIA P VASANJEE ON 5/23/19 @ 7:12PM:

TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ANASTASIA P VASANJEE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

05/21/2019:TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ANASTASIA P VASANJEE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

05/20/2019:PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

05/20/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

05/20/2019:NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

05/20/2019:COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/20/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 20 DAY SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON ANASTASIA P VASANJEE ON 5/23/19 @ 7:12PM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TWENTY DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ANASTASIA P VASANJEE AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Case 432019CC000889CCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 5/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less