This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 07/11/2019 at 17:45:51 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS CALLAHAN, JAYNE D

Case Summary

On 06/17/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CALLAHAN, JAYNE D. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JENNIFER WATERS and WATERS, JENNIFER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JENNIFER WATERS

WATERS, JENNIFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

CALLAHAN, JAYNE D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ALVAREZ, MELISSA

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAYNE D CALLAHAN AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 8.6.19 AT 9AM

06/18/2019:PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAYNE D CALLAHAN AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 8.6.19 AT 9AM

PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

06/17/2019:PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

06/17/2019:NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

COMPLAINT

06/17/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/17/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • Event PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE scheduled on 8/6/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JENNIFER WATERS presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRETRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED TO JAYNE D CALLAHAN AND RETURNED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-SERVICE WITH NOTICE OF PRETRIAL HEARING SET ON 8.6.19 AT 9AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED PRETRIAL SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY EMAIL $10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Case 432019SC001043SCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Event Date: 08/06/2019 09:00; Judge: WATERS, JENNIFER; Docket Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MX A2-1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ, MELISSA