This case was last updated from Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County on 03/09/2019 at 19:31:22 (UTC).

AUSTIN, TORRIE C VS KLOORFAIN, MICHELE C

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 AUSTIN, TORRIE C filed an Other lawsuit against KLOORFAIN, MICHELE C. This case was filed in Nineteenth Circuit Courts - Martin County, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LEVIN, STEVEN J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LEVIN, STEVEN J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUSTIN, TORRIE C

Defendant

KLOORFAIN, MICHELE C

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE-57.081:

02/08/2019:CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE-57.081:

AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES:

02/08/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES:

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT:

02/08/2019:FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT:

LETTER DATED 1/31/19 TO INMATE TORRIE C AUSTIN:

01/31/2019:LETTER DATED 1/31/19 TO INMATE TORRIE C AUSTIN:

WRIT OF REPLEVIN/POSSESSION COMPLAINT FOR RECOVERY OF ALL PERSONAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 4858 SE SALVAORI ROAD STUART FLORIDA 34997:

01/25/2019:WRIT OF REPLEVIN/POSSESSION COMPLAINT FOR RECOVERY OF ALL PERSONAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 4858 SE SALVAORI ROAD STUART FLORIDA 34997:

CIVIL COVER SHEET:

01/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET:

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCE-57.081:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF INSOLVENCY AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF FEES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER DATED 1/31/19 TO INMATE TORRIE C AUSTIN:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF REPLEVIN/POSSESSION COMPLAINT FOR RECOVERY OF ALL PERSONAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 4858 SE SALVAORI ROAD STUART FLORIDA 34997:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Case 432019CA000103CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Judge: LEVIN , STEVEN J assigned

    Read MoreRead Less