This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 03/24/2019 at 04:00:22 (UTC).

ARENSMAN, SCOTT WARNER VS ARENSMAN, ZIVIA K

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 ARENSMAN, SCOTT WARNER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ARENSMAN, ZIVIA K. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARENSMAN, SCOTT WARNER

Respondent

ARENSMAN, ZIVIA K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COLTER, THOMAS LUKE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE ZIVIA K. ARENSMAN SERVED 1.19.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED TO ZIVIA K ARENSMAN & MAILED TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • STANDING TEMPORARY DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PROPOSED 20 DAY SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AND RETURNED BY MAIL $10.55 - ZIVIA K ARENSMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT SIGNED BY SCOTT WARNER ARENSMAN ON 1.4.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - SCOTT WARNER ARENSMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY THOMAS L COLTER AND THE COLTER LAW GROUP ON BEHALF OF SCOTT WARNER ARENSMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • Case 432019DR000006DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less