This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 04/17/2019 at 14:19:12 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, KNIGHTEN, THOMAS ALLEN Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK, KNIGHTEN, THOMAS ALLEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is METZGER, ELIZABETH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

METZGER, ELIZABETH A

 

Party Details

Claimant

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Not Classified By Court

MURPHY, CHRISTINE

Decedent

KNIGHTEN, THOMAS ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

FOWLER, MICHAEL D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM: AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK $759.97

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • RECORDED DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • COPY REQUEST PROCESSED:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • COPY REQUEST RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE - THOMAS ALLEN KNIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • COVER LETTER TO THE CLERK DATED 01/24/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • CONSENT TO APPOINMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WIAVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Case 432019CP000059CPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 1/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less