This case was last updated from Martin County Courts on 03/24/2019 at 04:42:47 (UTC).

ALEXANDER, KATHLEEN VS ALEXANDER, CHARLES E

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 ALEXANDER, KATHLEEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ALEXANDER, CHARLES E. This case was filed in Martin County Courts, Martin County Courthouse located in Martin, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Martin County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martin County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Martin, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCNICHOLAS, MICHAEL J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALEXANDER, KATHLEEN

Respondent

ALEXANDER, CHARLES E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BATTS, L LISA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER -CHARLES ALEXANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • ORDER TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • RESPONSE TO WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF AND HUSBAND'S COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • HUSBANDS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FILED BY ATTORNEY LISA BATTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE-CHARLES E ALEXANDER-INDIVIDUAL SERVICE OF SUMMONS-SERVED 02/14/19 AT 3:39PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • STANDING TEMPORARY DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2019
  • FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT- PETITIONER DATED 02.04.2019:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • PROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- PETITIONER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • IDENTIFICATION OF PETITIONER:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH PROPERTY BUT NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS- APPROVED:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Case 432019DR000106DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 2/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less