This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/18/2019 at 11:03:03 (UTC).

YVONNE, YVONNE VS MIZELL, MAZIE

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 YVONNE, YVONNE filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against MIZELL, MAZIE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************H-02

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Yvonne, Yvonne

Respondent

Mizell, Mazie

Not Classified By Court

Ramos, Josie, MD

Alvarez, Manuel E, PHD

Toomer, Jethro W., PHD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Witlin, Ira M.

Respondent Attorney

REGIONAL COUNSEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • SRS Disposed by Other (Case Status Closed); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Ordr Determ Inc & Appt Plen Guardian; Event Type: Event; Comments: YVONNE LOUISE MIZELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Report and Recommendation and Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: PLENARY/ YVONNE LOUISE MIZELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: RDEX/ RAMOS, MD/ 3RC; IRA M. WITLIN, ESQ; GM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: RAMOS, MD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Report of Doctors Examination; Event Type: Event; Comments: RAMOS, MD/ PLENARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Determination of Capacity; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: TOOMER, PHD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Report of Doctors Examination; Event Type: Event; Comments: TOOMER, PHD/ PLENARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Certificate of Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: ALVAREZ, PHD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Report of Doctors Examination; Event Type: Event; Comments: ALVAREZ, PHD/ PLENARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Formal Notice by Mail; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Fax Confirmation; Event Type: Event; Comments: DC PACKAGE/ TOOMER, PHD; RAMOS, MD (FAILED 2X)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Notice and Order Reagarding Petition to Determine Incapacity; Event Type: Event; Comments: / CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3470017AMT PAID:$232.00 NAME:WITLIN, IRA M. 9990 SW 77TH AVE PH 6 MIAMI FL 33156-2661 COMMENT:CONFIDENTIAL CASE IN ODYSSEY ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3418-MH FILING FEE1$232.00$232.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Petition to Determine Competency; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Hearing Info: Determination of Capacity; Hearing Code: DC; Hearing Time: 10:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less