This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 04/07/2021 at 21:00:53 (UTC).

YOKO, LLC VS. LOST AND FOUND SALOON, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2017 YOKO, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOST AND FOUND SALOON, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-05

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yoko, LLC

Defendant

Lost and Found Saloon, Inc.

Not Classified By Court

Address, Eviction Property

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kim, Philip

 

Court Documents

Stipulation

06/27/2017 - Stipulation

Order of Dismissal

06/27/2017 - Order of Dismissal

Service Returned

06/22/2017 - Service Returned

Complaint

06/15/2017 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 30591:2377; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lost and Found Saloon Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2130007AMT PAID:$10.00 ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/20/2017 REGISTER#:213CASHIER:HPUPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketDocket Entry: Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketDocket Entry: 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lost and Found Saloon Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490061AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:KIM, PHILIP 3550 BISCAYNE BLVD STE 408 MIAMI FL 33137-3854 ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.00 RECEIPT DATE:06/20/2017 REGISTER#:349CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Address, Eviction Property is a litigant

Latest cases where LOST & FOUND INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA LOST & FOUND is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kim, Philip