This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/25/2019 at 22:03:06 (UTC).

WYNNE BUILDING CORP D/B/A KENDALL COMMERCIAL CENTE VS. INCLAN PAINTING & WATERPROOFING CORP

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 WYNNE BUILDING CORP D/B/A KENDALL COMMERCIAL CENTE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against INCLAN PAINTING WATERPROOFING CORP. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wynne Building Corp d/b/a Kendall Commercial Cente

Defendant and Not Classified By Court

Inclan Painting & Waterproofing Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Velez, Andres

Defendant Attorney

Vega, Daniel R

 

Court Documents

Motion to Vacate Judgment

02/05/2019 - Motion to Vacate Judgment

Order of Dismissal

02/05/2019 - Order of Dismissal

Complaint

11/21/2018 - Complaint

Notice of Default Not Entered

01/28/2019 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Affidavit as to Costs

01/24/2019 - Affidavit as to Costs

Motion for Final Judgment

01/24/2019 - Motion for Final Judgment

Order of Dismissal

02/05/2019 - Order of Dismissal

Response to Motion

01/11/2019 - Response to Motion

Notice of Appearance

12/04/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Default Final Judgment

01/25/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Motion for Extension of Time

12/04/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Default

01/24/2019 - Motion for Default

Order:

01/14/2019 - Order:

Service Returned

01/24/2019 - Service Returned

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31322:3801; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Inclan Painting & Waterproofing Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Vacate Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANSWER OR OTHER PAPER FILED BY DEFENDANT Parties: Inclan Painting & Waterproofing Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31312:545; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Inclan Painting & Waterproofing Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event; Comments: AND AFF OF NON PAYMENT OF RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN RESPONSE TO DEFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: DVEGA@TEVTLAW.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2130094AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/26/2018 REGISTER#:213CASHIER:CAREYSH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Inclan Painting & Waterproofing Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3350027AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:VELEZ, ANDRES 8000 S US HIGHWAY 1 PORT SAINT LUCIE FL 34952-2357 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$185.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.