This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/08/2019 at 12:25:19 (UTC).

VERENCA INVESTMENTS INTERNATIONAL, INC. VS. LEASE 2 OWN TIRES AND RIMS & MORE, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 VERENCA INVESTMENTS INTERNATIONAL, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LEASE 2 OWN TIRES AND RIMS MORE, INC. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

Verenca Investments International, Inc.

Defendant

Lease 2 Own Tires And Rims & More, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hernandez, Daniel R

Hernandez, Daniel R, ESQ

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing-

02/07/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Order:

02/07/2019 - Order:

Notice of Appeal

02/06/2019 - Notice of Appeal

Notice of Appeal

02/06/2019 - Notice of Appeal

Emergency Motion

02/06/2019 - Emergency Motion

Writ of Possession Issued

01/31/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Order:

01/28/2019 - Order:

Motion to Vacate

01/23/2019 - Motion to Vacate

Default Final Judgment

01/17/2019 - Default Final Judgment

Non-Military Affidavit

12/13/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion to Strike

12/11/2018 - Motion to Strike

Motion to Dismiss

12/06/2018 - Motion to Dismiss

Service Returned

11/29/2018 - Service Returned

Complaint

11/27/2018 - Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • Evictions; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON DFNT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION IS GRANTED IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appeal; Book/Page: 31323:3247; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Emergency Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION/PENDING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lease 2 Own Tires And Rims & More Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: DENYING DEF'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO VACATE THE DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Vacate; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGEMENT (EMERGENCY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Default Final Judgment; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lease 2 Own Tires And Rims & More Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lease 2 Own Tires And Rims & More Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2180016AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:HERNANDEZ, DANIEL R 8444 NW 141 TERRACE #3904 MIAMI LAKES FL 33016 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Lease 2 Own Tires And Rims & More Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3390020AMT PAID:$185.00 NAME:HERNANDEZ, DANIEL R 8444 NW 141 TERRACE #3904 MIAMI LAKES FL 33016 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Hearing Info: Evictions; Hearing Code: EVICT; Hearing Time: 2:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less