This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/14/2018 at 05:11:21 (UTC).

U S BANK N A VS FIDELITY LAND TRUST COMPANY LLC (THE)

Case Summary

On 05/05/2013 U S BANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FIDELITY LAND TRUST COMPANY LLC THE. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U.S. BANK NA

U S Bank N A

Defendants

FIDELITY LAND TRUST COMPANY LLC THE

MULLICK, SUNDEEP K

SOOD MULLICK, SAPNA

GREAT FLORIDA BANK

HSBC BANK USA NA

BRICKELL KEY MASTER ASSN INC

TEQUESTA POINT AT BRICKELL KEY ETC

THREE TEQUESTA POINT ETC

Reppert, Patrick

Sood, Ranjit

Mullick, Sapna

Sood, Sapna

Tequesta Point At Brickell Key (etc)

Florida Community Bank (na)

Best Roofing

Three Tequesta Point (etc)

Fidelity Land Trust Company Llc (the)

Not Classified By Court

Pearson Bitman LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Saavedra Antonio X

Prociv, Justin Gregory

Ali I Gilson (esq)

Ortega, Justin Bennett

Defendant Attorneys

Mullick, Sundeep K

Coe, Rachel Mendes

Daniel A Milian

Druker Shaina

Samuel Landol Jr

Bernard A Jackvony

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

07/10/2018 - Notice of Filing:

Certificate of Title

06/19/2018 - Certificate of Title

Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee

04/18/2018 - Mortgage Foreclosure Publication Fee

Notice of Sale

02/22/2018 - Notice of Sale

Response:

02/12/2018 - Response:

Motion to Withdraw

12/11/2017 - Motion to Withdraw

Notice of Filing:

04/21/2017 - Notice of Filing:

Summons Returned - No Service

08/28/2015 - Summons Returned - No Service

Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

04/15/2015 - Order Denying Motion to Dismiss

Motion for Default

04/15/2015 - Motion for Default

Cancellation Notice

11/14/2014 - Cancellation Notice

Order:

11/12/2014 - Order:

Notice of Action - Publication

04/18/2014 - Notice of Action - Publication

Service Return for Unknown Party

03/25/2014 - Service Return for Unknown Party

Notice:

03/19/2014 - Notice:

Notice of Appearance

02/24/2014 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

11/26/2013 - Notice of Appearance

Complaint

05/05/2013 - Complaint

182 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO SHERIFF WITH CHECK # 620336 $115.00 Parties: Fidelity Land Trust Company Llc (the)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Writ of Possession; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Mortgage Foreclosure; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOT FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480340 AMT PAID:$50.00 NAME:ORTEGA, JUSTIN BENNETT 110 SE 6TH ST STE 2400 FORT LAUDERDALE FL 33301-5056 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3117-REOPEN CASE FEE 1 $50.00 $50.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH TENDER A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Writ of Possession; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
221 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2017
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 2:45PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2015
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 8:45AM

    Read MoreRead Less