This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/16/2020 at 11:25:01 (UTC).

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS ARSENIO VALDIVIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ARSENIO VALDIVIA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

THE BANK OF NEW YORK

Defendants

MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, FLORIDA

GODING, KARIM H

VALDIVIA, ARSENIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meisels, Jonathan Ian

Defendant Attorney

Sherman, David Alan

 

Court Documents

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Order to Show Cause

02/15/2019 - Order to Show Cause

Affidavit of:

05/13/2019 - Affidavit of:

Certificate of Title

07/25/2019 - Certificate of Title

Service Returned

12/27/2018 - Service Returned

Returned Mail

08/29/2019 - Returned Mail

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

12/01/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

12/01/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Lis Pendens

11/28/2018 - Lis Pendens

Notice of Sale

06/11/2019 - Notice of Sale

Motion:

02/08/2019 - Motion:

Service Returned

01/09/2019 - Service Returned

Lis Pendens

11/28/2018 - Lis Pendens

Final Judgment by Judge

05/21/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Summons Returned - No Service

12/27/2018 - Summons Returned - No Service

Notice:

11/28/2018 - Notice:

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: ARSENIO VALDIVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail; Event Type: Event; Comments: ARSENIO VALDIVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Disbursement (plaintiff); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Title; Book/Page: 31549:3369; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMortgage Foreclosure Voucher Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: DOC STAMPS//PL//EMDR//87439

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Sale; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketMortgage Foreclosure Deposit; Event Type: Event; Comments: 20/PL/24274/DOC STAMPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketBid Amount; Event Type: Event; Comments: PL/24274/BIDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450020AMT PAID:$264.00 NAME:ROBERTSON, ANSCHUTZ AND SCHNEID, COMMENT:24274 ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3210-DOC. STAMPS - DEED1$264.00$264.00 TENDER TYPE:WIRE DUE FROM ESCROWTENDER AMT:$264.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/09/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketMortgage Foreclosure Sale; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510164AMT PAID:$1,915.00 NAME:MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN 6409 CONGRESS AVE STE 100 BOCA RATON FL 33487-2853 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1 $1,906.00 $1,906.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens; Book/Page: 31238:2252; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Mortgage Foreclosure Sale; Hearing Code: SALE; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less