This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/21/2019 at 20:26:57 (UTC).

SYNCHRONY BANK VS VANESSA SERRANO

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 SYNCHRONY BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VANESSA SERRANO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SYNCHRONY BANK

Defendant

SERRANO, VANESSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jovanovich, Zoran David

Defendant Attorneys

Kardatzke, Erik, ESQ

Baldwin, Bruce B

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

Service Returned

01/03/2019 - Service Returned

Notice of Appearance

01/04/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion to Dismiss

01/07/2019 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

02/13/2019 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/12/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice of Hearing-

01/18/2019 - Notice of Hearing-

Civil Cover

11/28/2018 - Civil Cover

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SERRANO VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Dismiss; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Kardatzke Erik ESQ; SERRANO VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SERRANO VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670011AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/30/2018 REGISTER#:267CASHIER:ORTEGAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: SERRANO VANESSA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3430356AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:JOVANOVICH, ZORAN DAVID ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. 700 WEST HILLSBORO BLVD DEERFIELD BEACH FL 33441-1612 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less