This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/27/2020 at 16:23:49 (UTC).

SUPRA MEDICAL GROUP, II, LLC., VS GEICO GENRAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 SUPRA MEDICAL GROUP, II, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GEICO GENRAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUPRA MEDICAL GROUP, II, LLC.,

PEREZ, ARIADNA

Defendant

GEICO GENRAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Iglesia, Jose R

Defendant Attorney

Burgos, Karla

 

Court Documents

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

06/03/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Order:

04/16/2020 - Order:

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

03/13/2020 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Notice of Interrogatory

03/09/2020 - Notice of Interrogatory

Order on Motion to Compel

12/18/2019 - Order on Motion to Compel

Response to Request for Production

12/17/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Order on Motion to Compel

11/14/2019 - Order on Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

11/08/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

08/22/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

07/01/2019 - Motion to Compel

Pretrial Catalog

05/16/2019 - Pretrial Catalog

Motion for Summary Judgment

05/16/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

05/15/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Privilege Log

05/15/2019 - Privilege Log

Motion to Compel

02/28/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Production

01/08/2019 - Notice of Production

Pre Trial Summons

11/13/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Admissions

11/05/2018 - Request for Admissions

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON PLTS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO GENRAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2770032AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$40.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/13/2018 REGISTER#:277CASHIER:ANDELLW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520002AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:IGLESIA, JOSE R LAW OFFICE OF JOSE R. IGLESIA LLC 7154 SW 47TH STR MIAMI FL 33155-4664 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less