This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/22/2019 at 23:47:19 (UTC).

SUAREZ MURIAS REAL ESTATE LLLP VS. RAFAEL RAMOS

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 SUAREZ MURIAS REAL ESTATE LLLP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RAFAEL RAMOS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-21

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Suarez Murias Real Estate LLLP

Defendant

Ramos, Rafael

Not Classified By Court

Eviction Property Address

 

Court Documents

Letter of Correspondence

02/07/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Writ of Possession Issued

02/01/2019 - Writ of Possession Issued

Amended Final Judgment

01/30/2019 - Amended Final Judgment

Final Judgment by Judge

01/29/2019 - Final Judgment by Judge

Notice:

01/17/2019 - Notice:

Motion to Strike

01/15/2019 - Motion to Strike

Answer

01/10/2019 - Answer

Notice of Default Not Entered

01/08/2019 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Answer

01/08/2019 - Answer

Letter of Correspondence

01/07/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Service Returned

12/28/2018 - Service Returned

Motion for Default

12/28/2018 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

12/28/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Non-Payment

12/28/2018 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Affidavit as to Costs

12/28/2018 - Affidavit as to Costs

Answer (Needing Translation)

12/26/2018 - Answer (Needing Translation)

Complaint

12/11/2018 - Complaint

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event; Comments: FROM PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: SHERIFF W/CK # 1245 Parties: Ramos Rafael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Final Judgment; Book/Page: 31317:2753; Event Type: Event; Comments: COURT COST ONLY OF $235.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31316:2820; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ramos Rafael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO HAVE OTHER PERSON APPEAR AT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Strike; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ramos Rafael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: BACK FROM TRANSLATION Parties: Ramos Rafael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: ANSWER FILED Parties: Ramos Rafael

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non-Payment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (Needing Translation); Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ramos Rafael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Filed at Hialeah; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Ramos Rafael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2120010AMT PAID:$195.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$195.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/11/201

    Read MoreRead Less