This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/22/2019 at 18:09:49 (UTC).

SPECTRUM HEALTH CARE CENTER INC. VS OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 SPECTRUM HEALTH CARE CENTER INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECTRUM HEALTH CARE CENTER INC.

Assignor

HAUGHTON, LETTY

Defendant

OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sorensen, Jon

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin W Silvanic

 

Court Documents

Subpoena Served

05/13/2019 - Subpoena Served

Notice of Taking Deposition

04/22/2019 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Motion for Relief from Judgment

04/12/2019 - Motion for Relief from Judgment

Response to Request for Admissions

04/12/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Answer

04/12/2019 - Answer

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/09/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Memorandum of Disposition

01/09/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

01/09/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

01/08/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

01/08/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

12/18/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Email Notice:

12/03/2018 - Email Notice:

Request for Admissions

12/03/2018 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

12/03/2018 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

12/03/2018 - Notice of Interrogatory

Statement of Claim

12/03/2018 - Statement of Claim

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Subpoena Served; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Relief from Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2670031AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:SORENSEN, JON 815 N HOMESTEAD BLVD, #511 HOMESTEAD FL 33030 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$290.00 REC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490011AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:SORENSEN, JON 815 N HOMESTEAD BLVD, #511 HOMESTEAD FL 33030 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less