This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/21/2020 at 17:39:29 (UTC).

SPECTRUM HEALTH CARE CENTER, INC. VS LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 SPECTRUM HEALTH CARE CENTER, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECTRUM HEALTH CARE CENTER, INC.

Assignor

LAROSE, ALSHANESSA

Defendant

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wajih A Shirazi (esq)

Defendant Attorney

Prado, Nicholas

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

09/11/2019 - Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Memorandum of Disposition

08/21/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

08/20/2019 - Notice of Cancellation of Hearing

Motion to Compel

07/24/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Extension of Time

06/06/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Admissions

06/06/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

05/14/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

05/14/2019 - Request for Production

Motion to Compel

03/19/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Summary Judgment

03/12/2019 - Motion for Summary Judgment

Reply to Answer

03/12/2019 - Reply to Answer

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

02/07/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Memorandum of Disposition

02/04/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Email Notice:

02/04/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

02/04/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

02/01/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Notice of Service of Process

01/17/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Statement of Claim

12/12/2018 - Statement of Claim

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event; Comments: BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2170003AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/17/2018 REGISTER#:217CASHIER:CAL5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3490002AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less