This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/16/2020 at 11:13:45 (UTC).

SPECTRUM HEALTH CARE CENTER, INC. VS GEICO INDMENITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 SPECTRUM HEALTH CARE CENTER, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDMENITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPECTRUM HEALTH CARE CENTER, INC.

Assignor

BAIN, DENNIS

Defendant

GEICO INDMENITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wajih A Shirazi (esq)

Defendant Attorney

Barrangan, Arlene

 

Court Documents

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

08/12/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Motion to Compel

07/26/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

07/26/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

07/26/2019 - Motion to Compel

Response to Request for Production

07/23/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Order on Motion to Compel

06/12/2019 - Order on Motion to Compel

Motion/petit for Enforcement

05/24/2019 - Motion/petit for Enforcement

Order on Motion to Compel

05/10/2019 - Order on Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

05/09/2019 - Motion to Compel

Reply to Answer

04/16/2019 - Reply to Answer

Notice of Filing:

04/11/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Response to Request for Admissions

04/10/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Appearance

04/08/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/07/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Appearance

01/18/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Notice:

01/10/2019 - Notice:

SP Pretrial Date

01/08/2019 - SP Pretrial Date

Statement of Claim

12/19/2018 - Statement of Claim

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Docket5 Minute Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ENFORCE COURT ORDER RELATING TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL DISCOVERY REQUEST AND FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Hearing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Event Type: Event; Comments: BEBEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2480008AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$50.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/08/2019 REGISTER#:248CASHIER:IRIARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GEICO INDMENITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3380028AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:WAJIH A SHIRAZI (ESQ) DOS SANTOS & SHIRAZI, LLC 10700 CARIBBEAN BLVD. PE CUTLER BAY FL 33189 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less