This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/02/2019 at 08:23:54 (UTC).

SILVERMAN CHIROPRACTIC & REHABILITATION CENTER VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 SILVERMAN CHIROPRACTIC REHABILITATION CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Silverman Chiropractic & Rehabilitation Center

Assignor

Gonzalez, Cristobal

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leon, John Williams

Defendant Attorney

Suarez, Linet

 

Court Documents

Motion for Extension of Time

05/01/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion to Compel

04/29/2019 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Interrogatory

04/16/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/16/2019 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

04/16/2019 - Request for Admissions

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

04/16/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Interrogatory

04/02/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/02/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Appearance

04/02/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Memorandum of Disposition

03/20/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/19/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/19/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Letter of Correspondence

03/14/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Email Notice:

03/14/2019 - Email Notice:

Notice of Service of Process

03/14/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Pre Trial Summons

02/07/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Memorandum of Disposition

12/12/2018 - Memorandum of Disposition

Pre Trial Summons

11/14/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: PRETRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2220065AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$380.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/14/2018 REGISTER#:222CASHIER:SIMONEG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520036AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:LEON, JOHN WILLIAMS 8000 GOVERNOR'S SQUARE BLVD PH404 MIAMI LAKES FL 33016 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.