This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 01/16/2020 at 11:46:50 (UTC).

SILVERMAN CHIROPRACTIC & REHABILITATION CENTER VS GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 SILVERMAN CHIROPRACTIC REHABILITATION CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Silverman Chiropractic & Rehabilitation Center

Assignor

Quintero, Andrea

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leon, John Williams

Defendant Attorney

Griggs, Erinn Mia

 

Court Documents

Letter of Correspondence

03/26/2019 - Letter of Correspondence

Pre Trial Summons

11/14/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Request for Admissions

04/18/2019 - Request for Admissions

Memorandum of Disposition

12/17/2018 - Memorandum of Disposition

Memorandum of Disposition

04/01/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Request for Production

04/18/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Process

03/26/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

05/03/2019 - Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Email Notice:

03/26/2019 - Email Notice:

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

03/29/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Request for Admissions

04/18/2019 - Request for Admissions

Motion to Compel

05/02/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Extension of Time

05/09/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Voluntary Dismissal

08/28/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Pre Trial Summons

02/07/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice:

04/18/2019 - Notice:

Notice of Interrogatory

04/18/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

03/29/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31592:4556; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2220060AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$380.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/14/2018 REGISTER#:222CASHIER:SIMONEG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3520046AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:LEON, JOHN WILLIAMS 8000 GOVERNOR'S SQUARE BLVD PH404 MIAMI LAKES FL 33016 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • HearingHearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.