This case was last updated from Miami Dade County Courts on 08/24/2022 at 06:07:30 (UTC).

SCG MASON BUILDING, LLC VS ISTITUTO MARANGONI MIAMI INC. ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 SCG MASON BUILDING, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ISTITUTO MARANGONI MIAMI INC. This case was filed in Miami Dade County Courts, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCG Mason Building, LLC

Defendants

Baykam, Hakan

ISTITUTO MARANGONI MIAMI INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Martin, Shane Patrick

Defendant Attorney

Zorrilla, Juan C

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal

10/16/2020 - Order of Dismissal

Stipulation for Dismissal

10/16/2020 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Motion to Amend

08/04/2020 - Motion to Amend

Order Extending Time for

07/14/2020 - Order Extending Time for

Notice of Hearing-

07/01/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Response to Motion

06/22/2020 - Response to Motion

Motion for Extension of Time

06/18/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

05/29/2020 - Motion for Extension of Time

AgreedOrder

04/07/2020 - AgreedOrder

Cancellation Notice

04/06/2020 - Cancellation Notice

Response:

04/06/2020 - Response:

Notice of Hearing-

03/12/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion to Modify

03/06/2020 - Motion to Modify

AgreedOrder

02/04/2020 - AgreedOrder

Order:

01/09/2020 - Order:

Notice of Hearing-

01/07/2020 - Notice of Hearing-

Motion:

01/07/2020 - Motion:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

01/07/2020 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 32158:919; Event Type: Event; Comments: WITH PREJUDICE Parties: ISTITUTO MARANGONI MIAMI INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Stipulation for Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion to Amend; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Extending Time for; Event Type: Event; Comments: DENIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • HearingHearing Info; Description: Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: MOTCAL; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion Calendar; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO DEPOSIT RENT INTO LANDLORD'S BANK ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Hearing-; Event Type: Event; Comments: 07/07/2020 AT 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Response to Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Zorrilla Juan C; ISTITUTO MARANGONI MIAMI INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Baykam Hakan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: ISTITUTO MARANGONI MIAMI INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3440053AMT PAID:$20.00NAME:MARTIN, SHANE PATRICK2 S BISCAYNE BLVDMIAMI FL 33131-1806COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.003139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$20.00RECEIPT DATE:01/10/2019REGISTER#:344CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3340067AMT PAID:$401.00NAME:MARTIN, SHANE PATRICK2 S BISCAYNE BLVDMIAMI FL 33131-1806COMMENT:ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITYUNITAMOUNT3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00RECEIPT DATE:12/27/2018REGISTER#:334CASHIER:EFILINGUSER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JUAN ZORRILLA