This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 11/11/2019 at 07:57:04 (UTC).

SAFE FINANCIAL GROUP LLC VS. ANTONIO GUERRA

Case Summary

On 11/27/2018 SAFE FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANTONIO GUERRA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Hialeah District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-21

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Hialeah District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFE FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

GUERRA, ANTONIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Restrepo, Vivian E.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

06/24/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Memorandum of Disposition

05/06/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Pre Trial Summons

05/06/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

03/20/2019 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Pre Trial Summons

03/27/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice of Appearance

02/28/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Memorandum of Disposition

01/28/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Service Returned

12/20/2018 - Service Returned

Statement of Claim

11/27/2018 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

11/27/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2090018AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/06/2019 REGISTER#:209CASHIER:ANGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GUERRA ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • SP Pretrial New Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2090015AMT PAID:$4.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2120-COPY4$1.00$4.00 TENDER TYPE:VISA CARDTENDER AMT:$24.00 RECEIPT DATE:05/06/2019 REGISTER#:209CASHIER:ANGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GUERRA ANTONIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3250008AMT PAID:$310.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$310.00 RECEIPT DATE:11/27/201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • Filed at Hialeah; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less