This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/20/2019 at 13:12:20 (UTC).

ROGER BAPTISTE VS CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 ROGER BAPTISTE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BAPTISTE, MIRELINE

BAPTISTE, ROGER

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth R Duboff

Defendant Attorney

Sevilla, Cristina A., ESQ

 

Court Documents

Answer and Affirmative Defense

12/28/2018 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Email Notice:

12/17/2018 - Email Notice:

Request for Production

11/28/2018 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

11/28/2018 - Notice of Interrogatory

Email Notice:

11/28/2018 - Email Notice:

Response to Request for Admissions

02/07/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

08/26/2019 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2018 - (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received

Request for Admissions

11/28/2018 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Taking Video Deposition

09/26/2019 - Notice of Taking Video Deposition

Notice of Appearance

12/17/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Civil Cover

11/28/2018 - Civil Cover

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event; Comments: AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Video Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Sevilla Cristina A. ESQ; CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: EMAIL ADDRESS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Sevilla Cristina A. ESQ; CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2160130AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:KENNETH R DUBOFF 680 NE 127TH ST NORTH MIAMI FL 33161-4879 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3510118AMT PAID:$401.00 NAME:KENNETH R DUBOFF 680 NE 127TH ST NORTH MIAMI FL 33161-4879 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3100-CIRCUIT FILING FEE1$401.00$401.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$401.00 RE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Email Notice; Event Type: Event; Comments: COURTDOCUMENT@DUBOFFLAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less