This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/24/2019 at 16:09:44 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK VS NELSON VILLALBA ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 REGIONS BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against NELSON VILLALBA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK

Defendants

MENEDEZ, RICHARD

MENENDEZ, RICHARD

NO 2, UNKNOWN TENANT

MENEDEZ, JESSICA

VILLALBA, NELSON

VILLALBA, SARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tompkins A Foster

 

Court Documents

Lis Pendens

11/28/2018 - Lis Pendens

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Lis Pendens

11/28/2018 - Lis Pendens

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/29/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

Service Returned

01/11/2019 - Service Returned

Civil Cover

11/28/2018 - Civil Cover

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Motion for Default

01/25/2019 - Motion for Default

Notice of Default Not Entered

01/29/2019 - Notice of Default Not Entered

Civil Cover

11/28/2018 - Civil Cover

Service Returned

01/11/2019 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

Service Returned

01/11/2019 - Service Returned

Service Returned

01/11/2019 - Service Returned

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3450319AMT PAID:$9.00 NAME:TOMPKINS A FOSTER PO BOX 3108 ORLANDO FL 32802-3108 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3142-RECORDING FEE1$4.00$4.00 3142-RECORDING FEE1$5.00$5.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Disposition Document; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Discharge/release of Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31368:2866; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Default Not Entered-Unknown Person(s); Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Default Not Entered; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VILLALBA SARA; MENENDEZ RICHARD; MENEDEZ JESSICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Of Unknown Parties; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VILLALBA NELSON; VILLALBA SARA; MENENDEZ RICHARD; MENEDEZ JESSICA; MENEDEZ RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: VILLALBA NELSON; VILLALBA SARA; MENENDEZ RICHARD; MENEDEZ JESSICA; MENEDEZ RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3430350AMT PAID:$913.50 NAME:TOMPKINS A FOSTER PO BOX 3108 ORLANDO FL 32802-3108 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3201-FORECLOSURE FILING1$906.00$906.00 3102-MULTIPLE DEFENDANT1$2.50$2.50 3142-RECORDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Lis Pendens; Book/Page: 31238:731; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Directions to The Clerk; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Possession of Note; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less