This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/24/2019 at 23:12:52 (UTC).

RED DIAMOND MEDICAL GROUP LLC VS INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/10/2018 RED DIAMOND MEDICAL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RED DIAMOND MEDICAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

Lima, Migdalia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gonzalez, Neil M

Defendant Attorney

Campos, Raquel

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

05/22/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Response to Request for Production

02/20/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/18/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Response to Request for Admissions

02/18/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Privilege Log

02/18/2019 - Privilege Log

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

02/18/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/16/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Process

01/16/2019 - Notice of Service of Process

Memorandum of Disposition

01/16/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

01/10/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

01/08/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Notice of Appearance

01/03/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Pre Trial Summons

12/13/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Statement of Claim

12/10/2018 - Statement of Claim

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31457:1594; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Privilege Log; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Answer to Interrogatories; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: INFINITY INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2800033AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$240.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/13/2018 REGISTER#:280CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3420014AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:GONZALEZ, NEIL M LAW OFFICE OF GONZALEZ & ASSOCIATES, LLC 3403 NW 8 MIAMI FL 33122 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less