This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/17/2018 at 20:27:39 (UTC).

RACHELLE, MARY (PERSONAL REP) VS PEREZ, SERGIO

Case Summary

On 09/09/2013 RACHELLE, MARY PERSONAL REP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PEREZ, SERGIO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami-Dade County Courthouse located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************A-01

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami-Dade County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RACHELLE, MARY

Rinon-Ortiz, Dennis Ryan (estate Of)

Rachelle, Mary (personal Rep)

Defendants

PEREZ, SERGIO

BARLATIER, RODNEY

DUMEL, WILLIE

DTG Operations Inc

Cason, Cheryl

Dollar Rent A Car Systems Inc

Thrifty Car Rental

Key, Jeffrey

Dollar Thrifty Automotive Group Inc

Rental Car Finance Corp

Thrifty Car Rental Finance Corp

Baker, Kelvin, Sr

City Of Opa Locka

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

JOSEPH N NUSBAUM

Littky-Rubin, Julie Hope

Scott D Alexander

Shawn J Davis

Oscar Edmund Marrero

Lourdes Espino Wydler

John Wilke

Timothy F Malin

Jeffrey W Johnson

E Bruce Johnson

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition

09/21/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Unavailability/absence

03/27/2018 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Response to Request for Production

04/06/2017 - Response to Request for Production

Answer and Affirmative Defense

03/06/2017 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Notice:

02/28/2017 - Notice:

Request for Production

02/16/2017 - Request for Production

Request for Production

02/16/2017 - Request for Production

Request for Production

02/16/2017 - Request for Production

Notice of Taking Deposition

12/07/2016 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Order on Motion to Compel

07/26/2016 - Order on Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

05/04/2016 - Motion to Compel

Request:

12/23/2015 - Request:

Request for Production

12/01/2015 - Request for Production

Notice of Filing:

05/05/2015 - Notice of Filing:

Motion to Dismiss

04/09/2015 - Motion to Dismiss

Subpoena Returned

04/24/2014 - Subpoena Returned

Subpoena Returned

04/14/2014 - Subpoena Returned

Request for Hearing

12/23/2013 - Request for Hearing

203 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Copies; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability/absence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer to Amended Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
209 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Transfer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event; Comments: ATTORNEY:00372714 Parties: Perez Sergio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event; Comments: BADGE # 2019 P 09/13/2013 Parties: Barlatier Rodney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Perez Sergio; Barlatier Rodney; Dumel Willie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2013
  • E-Filing Number; Event Type: Event; Comments: EFILE NUMBER: 5276706

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • Hearing Info: 5 Minute Motion Calendar; Hearing Code: 5MIN; Hearing Time: 9:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • Hearing Info: Transfer Calendar; Hearing Code: TRAN; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less