This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/26/2019 at 06:21:04 (UTC).

PROS MIAMI HOMESTEAD, LLC VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 PROS MIAMI HOMESTEAD, LLC filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROS MIAMI HOMESTEAD, LLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

GREFIN, MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dapena, Jose A.

Defendant Attorney

De La O, Ana D

 

Court Documents

Motion for Protective Order

06/03/2019 - Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Attorneys Fees

04/24/2019 - Motion for Attorneys Fees

Notice of Filing:

04/24/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Motion for Extension of Time

02/13/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Motion for Extension of Time

02/13/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Memorandum of Disposition

01/24/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/22/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

01/16/2019 - Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial

Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

01/16/2019 - Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure

Letter of Correspondence

12/13/2018 - Letter of Correspondence

Pre Trial Summons

12/10/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Notice:

12/03/2018 - Notice:

Statement of Claim

12/03/2018 - Statement of Claim

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Protective Order; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Attorneys Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Filing; Event Type: Event; Comments: LETTER OF CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulated Waiver for Appearance at Pre-Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion To Invoke The Rules Of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter of Correspondence; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROS MIAMI HOMESTEAD LLC; PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: PROS MIAMI HOMESTEAD LLC; PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3080014AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/10/2018 REGISTER#:308CASHIER:MARIOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3500079AMT PAID:$80.00 NAME:DAPENA, JOSE A. 5975 SUNSET DR STE 102 MIAMI FL 33143-5198 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$80.00$80.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROS MIAMI HOMESTEAD, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dapena, Jose A.