This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 05/10/2020 at 14:04:55 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC. VS WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

Defendant

WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

ARGENAL, DIEGA NUBIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Assignee and Plaintiff Attorneys

Armando A Brana

Michael J. Feldman

Defendant Attorney

Iftikhar Memon

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing:

10/18/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Order of Dismissal

09/25/2019 - Order of Dismissal

Notice of Jury Trial

08/12/2019 - Notice of Jury Trial

Request for Production

07/03/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

06/12/2019 - Notice of Answer to Interrogatories

Response to Request for Production

06/05/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Production

06/05/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Response to Request for Production

06/05/2019 - Response to Request for Production

Motion for Relief from Judgment

06/05/2019 - Motion for Relief from Judgment

Cancellation Notice

06/04/2019 - Cancellation Notice

Request:

03/26/2019 - Request:

Motion to Strike

03/01/2019 - Motion to Strike

Motion for Default

02/27/2019 - Motion for Default

Notice of Filing:

02/11/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Interrogatory

02/11/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

02/08/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

12/14/2018 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

12/14/2018 - Request for Admissions

182 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31732:156; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Order Awarding Attorney Fees; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Judgment by Judge; Book/Page: 31681:2099; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF ATTY FEES AND COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event; Comments: AFFIDAVIT & REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Compliance; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Filing:; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
180 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Demand for Jury Trial; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2540013AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/24/2018 REGISTER#:254CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3480055AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:ARMANDO A BRANA 7315 SW 87TH AVE STE. # 300 MIAMI FL 33173-5473 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$175.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less