This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/22/2019 at 12:33:22 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC. VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/29/2018 PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL GROUP, INC.

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Assignee

ARMENTEROS, THANIA M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorney

Armando A Brana

Defendant Attorney

Altenor, Johane

 

Court Documents

Order:

05/06/2019 - Order:

Answer

04/18/2019 - Answer

Motion to Compel

04/25/2019 - Motion to Compel

Request:

05/02/2019 - Request:

Request:

04/26/2019 - Request:

Motion to Compel

04/16/2019 - Motion to Compel

Request:

04/22/2019 - Request:

Motion to Compel

04/16/2019 - Motion to Compel

Motion for Default

04/16/2019 - Motion for Default

Request for Production

12/29/2018 - Request for Production

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

02/11/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Request for Admissions

12/29/2018 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing:

02/21/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Notice of Filing:

03/15/2019 - Notice of Filing:

Request for Admissions

02/21/2019 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

02/21/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

12/29/2018 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

02/21/2019 - Request for Admissions

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31447:3729; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel; Event Type: Event; Comments: DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3130083AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:ARMANDO A BRANA 7315 SW 87TH AVE STE. # 300 MIAMI FL 33173-5473 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event; Comments: 99.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Batch Cover Sheet; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.