This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/27/2019 at 00:56:21 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL BUILDING INSPECTIONS, LLC VS CITIZIENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 PROFESSIONAL BUILDING INSPECTIONS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZIENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, South Dade Government Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-26

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    South Dade Government Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROFESSIONAL BUILDING INSPECTIONS, LLC

Defendant

Citiziens Property Insurance Corporation

Assignee

Koonin, Shannon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Velasquez, Sol G., ESQ

Defendant Attorney

Nicole Lauren Wulwick

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

04/04/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

Motion:

03/15/2019 - Motion:

Motion for Leave

03/13/2019 - Motion for Leave

Motion for Extension of Time

02/28/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Response to Request for Admissions

02/28/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Amended Statement of Claim

02/20/2019 - Amended Statement of Claim

Motion:

02/15/2019 - Motion:

Answer and Affirmative Defense

02/13/2019 - Answer and Affirmative Defense

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

01/14/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Memorandum of Disposition

01/14/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice of Unavailability/absence

01/11/2019 - Notice of Unavailability/absence

Notice of Appearance

01/11/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Service Returned

01/11/2019 - Service Returned

Notice of Interrogatory

11/28/2018 - Notice of Interrogatory

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Request for Production

11/28/2018 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

11/28/2018 - Request for Admissions

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Book/Page: 31396:2931; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Leave; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Extension of Time; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer and Affirmative Defense; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2550004AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:MASTER CARDTENDER AMT:$30.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/19/2018 REGISTER#:255CASHIER:MONICAA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Citiziens Property Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3560007AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:VELASQUEZ, SOL G., ESQ GIMENEZ & CARRILLO, LLC 5775 BLUE LAGOON DRIVE, SU MIAMI FL 33126 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING AC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Production; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Interrogatory; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less