This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 10/07/2019 at 06:18:45 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS SAMANTHA CANTO

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAMANTHA CANTO. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Coral Gables District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

CANTO, SAMANTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

02/26/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Pre Trial Summons

04/10/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

Memorandum of Disposition

08/06/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Notice:

11/28/2018 - Notice:

Notice:

03/16/2019 - Notice:

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/28/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Pre Trial Summons

12/28/2018 - Pre Trial Summons

Summons Returned - No Service

01/14/2019 - Summons Returned - No Service

Service Returned

05/01/2019 - Service Returned

Voluntary Dismissal

05/28/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3140041AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/11/2019 REGISTER#:314CASHIER:ROJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CANTO SAMANTHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • SP Pretrial New Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2160014AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/31/2018 REGISTER#:216CASHIER:MPAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: CANTO SAMANTHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550174AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL 806 DOUGALS RDSOUTH TOWER, SUITE 200 CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less