This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 08/08/2019 at 15:24:31 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES VS ANGELA M GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANGELA M GOMEZ. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Coral Gables District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-25

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Coral Gables District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES

Defendant

GOMEZ, ANGELA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

11/28/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Statement of Claim

11/28/2018 - Statement of Claim

Memorandum of Disposition

03/05/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Service Returned

01/11/2019 - Service Returned

Notice:

11/28/2018 - Notice:

Pre Trial Summons

01/02/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3100261AMT PAID:$10.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/02/2019 REGISTER#:310CASHIER:MARIOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • SP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Pre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: GOMEZ ANGELA M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • SP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3550035AMT PAID:$175.00 NAME:KAMINSKI, DAVID MICHAEL 806 DOUGALS RDSOUTH TOWER, SUITE 200 CORAL GABLES FL 33134 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$175.00$175.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Hearing Info: Small Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Hearing Code: SPPTC; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less