This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 09/27/2020 at 12:16:01 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC (LLC) VS PAUL G HALLER

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PAUL G HALLER. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Assoc (LLC)

Defendant

Haller, Paul G

Garnishees

Northern Trust Company

Northern Trust Co

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason S Dragutsky

 

Court Documents

Satisfaction of Judgment

04/22/2020 - Satisfaction of Judgment

Answer of Garnishee

03/25/2020 - Answer of Garnishee

Final Jdgmt Agnst Garnish $

10/08/2019 - Final Jdgmt Agnst Garnish $

Motion for Final Judgment In Garnishment

10/03/2019 - Motion for Final Judgment In Garnishment

Notice:

09/05/2019 - Notice:

Notice:

09/05/2019 - Notice:

Answer of Garnishee

08/27/2019 - Answer of Garnishee

Continuing Writ of Garnishment Issued

07/15/2019 - Continuing Writ of Garnishment Issued

Default

03/22/2019 - Default

Service Returned

03/21/2019 - Service Returned

Affidavit of Indebtedness

03/21/2019 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Affidavit as to Costs

03/21/2019 - Affidavit as to Costs

Motion for Default Judgment

03/21/2019 - Motion for Default Judgment

Motion for Default

03/21/2019 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

03/21/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Indebtedness

03/21/2019 - Affidavit of Indebtedness

Service Returned

12/06/2018 - Service Returned

ESummons 20 Day Issued

11/30/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Satisfaction of Judgment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer of Garnishee; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Northern Trust Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Final Jdgmt Agnst Garnish $; Book/Page: 31644:3707; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Northern Trust Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Motion for Final Judgment In Garnishment; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: OF EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Answer of Garnishee; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Northern Trust Co

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Notice:; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DFNT (GARNISHMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2120005AMT PAID:$85.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2134-WRIT (GARD) ADD FE1$85.00$85.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$85.00 RECEIPT DATE:07/23/2019 REGISTER#:212CASHIER:BELKISG

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Non-Military Affidavit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit of Indebtedness; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Affidavit as to Costs; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2230118AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JASON S DRAGUTSKY 7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 101 MIAMI FL 33173-2535 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Haller Paul G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketDocket Entry: Receipt:; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540084AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:JASON S DRAGUTSKY 7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 101 MIAMI FL 33173-2535 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry: Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $11739.66

    Read MoreRead Less