This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 06/30/2019 at 02:27:27 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC (LLC) VS BRENDA R PHILIPS

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRENDA R PHILIPS. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, North Dade Justice Center located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-23

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North Dade Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Assoc (LLC)

Defendant

Philips, Brenda R

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason S Dragutsky

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/28/2018 - Complaint

Summons Returned - No Service

12/20/2018 - Summons Returned - No Service

ESummons 20 Day Issued

12/03/2018 - ESummons 20 Day Issued

(M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

11/30/2018 - (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned - No Service; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3470006AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:JASON S DRAGUTSKY 7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 101 MIAMI FL 33173-2535 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$10.00 R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • 20 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ESummons 20 Day Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Philips Brenda R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (M) 20 Day (P) Summons (Sub) Received; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3540079AMT PAID:$300.00 NAME:JASON S DRAGUTSKY 7765 SW 87TH AVE STE 101 MIAMI FL 33173-2535 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$300.00$300.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event; Comments: $8318.80

    Read MoreRead Less