Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 07/25/2019 at 05:31:19 (UTC).

POPULAR REAL ESTATE LLC VS. ARISMENDY PINA

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 POPULAR REAL ESTATE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARISMENDY PINA. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************C-24

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Popular Real Estate LLC

Defendant

Pina, Arismendy

Not Classified By Court

Eviction Property Address

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Abbie R. Salt

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Disposition

02/25/2019 - Memorandum of Disposition

Mediators Report

01/29/2019 - Mediators Report

Order of Dismissal

01/29/2019 - Order of Dismissal

Notice of Appearance

01/29/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Order:

01/29/2019 - Order:

Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

01/25/2019 - Order of Referral to Mediation Unit

Motion for Default

01/09/2019 - Motion for Default

Non-Military Affidavit

01/09/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit of Non-Payment

01/09/2019 - Affidavit of Non-Payment

Affidavit as to Costs

01/09/2019 - Affidavit as to Costs

Motion to Strike

01/09/2019 - Motion to Strike

Service Returned

01/02/2019 - Service Returned

Answer

12/27/2018 - Answer

Complaint

12/21/2018 - Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediators Report; Event Type: Event; Comments: SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal; Book/Page: 31315:977; Event Type: Event; Comments: STIP Parties: Pina Arismendy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Order of Dismissal; Event Type: Judgment; Comments: STIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appearance; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pina Arismendy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order; Event Type: Event; Comments: ON MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT AND SETTING COURT ORDER MEDIATION FOR 1-29-2019 AT 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Mediation; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: L&T MEDIATION ORFERED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Referral to Mediation Unit; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Special Sets; Event Type: Hearing; Comments: MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Default; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Service Returned; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pina Arismendy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Summons and Complaint Mailed; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • 5 Day Summons Issued; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Pina Arismendy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Filed at Miami Beach; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Receipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2740001AMT PAID:$195.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$185.00$185.00 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$195.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/21/201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Hearing Info: Mediation; Hearing Code: MEDIATE; Hearing Time: 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Hearing Info: Special Sets; Hearing Code: SPECSETS; Hearing Time: 9:15AM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POPULAR REAL ESTATE, LLC is a litigant