Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Dade Court System on 02/22/2020 at 11:27:48 (UTC).

POMPANO SPINE CENTER VS GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/17/2018 POMPANO SPINE CENTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Dade Court System, Miami Beach District Court located in Miami-Dade, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************P-24

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Dade Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Miami Beach District Court

  • County, State:

    Miami-Dade, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pompano Spine Center

Defendant

Geico Indemnity Company

Assignee

Regis, Emilienne

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

The Patino Law Firm

Defendant Attorney

Doe, Darien M

 

Court Documents

Motion:

10/11/2019 - Motion:

Motion:

10/11/2019 - Motion:

Motion:

10/11/2019 - Motion:

Motion for Sanctions

10/11/2019 - Motion for Sanctions

Motion:

10/11/2019 - Motion:

Motion:

10/11/2019 - Motion:

Notice of Interrogatory

06/15/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Motion for Sanctions

06/15/2019 - Motion for Sanctions

Motion:

06/15/2019 - Motion:

Notice of Interrogatory

06/15/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

06/15/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Notice of Interrogatory

04/05/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

04/01/2019 - Request for Production

Notice of Interrogatory

04/01/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Admissions

04/01/2019 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatory

02/12/2019 - Notice of Interrogatory

Request for Production

02/12/2019 - Request for Production

Pre Trial Summons

01/24/2019 - Pre Trial Summons

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED REGARDING FAILURE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S REQUEST TO PRODUCE REGARDING REASONABLENESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: TO DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR SANCTIONS REGARDING MEDICAL NECESSITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR SANCTIONS REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR SANCTIONS TO PRODUCE REASONABLENESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: FOR SANCTIONS COVERAGE INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED REGARDING MEDICAL NECESSITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: MOTION TO DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED REGARDING FAILURE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Event Type: Event; Comments: DEEM OBJECTIONS WAIVED REGARDING DEMAND LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Event Type: Event; Comments: PIP SCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Disposition; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Pre-Trial Conference; Event Type: Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:2100055AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE1$10.00$10.00 TENDER TYPE:CHECKTENDER AMT:$80.00 RECEIPT DATE:01/24/2019 REGISTER#:210

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketSP Pretrial Date; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketSP Pre Trial Summons Issued; Event Type: Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre Trial Summons; Event Type: Event; Comments: Parties: Geico Indemnity Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Event Type: Event; Comments: RECEIPT#:3570015AMT PAID:$55.00 NAME:THE PATINO LAW FIRM COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODEQUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 2100-COUNTY FILING FEE1$55.00$55.00 TENDER TYPE:E-FILING ACHTENDER AMT:$55.00 RECEIPT DATE:12/19/2018 REGISTER#:357

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Event Type: Event

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pompano Spine Center is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Doe, Darien M